EP4149764 - DROPLET MEASUREMENT USING STROBED LED SOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kateeva, Inc. 7015 Gateway Boulevard Newark, CA 94560 / US | [2023/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Jerry Newark, California 94560 / US | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2023/12] | Application number, filing date | 21803622.6 | 07.05.2021 | [2023/12] | WO2021US70519 | Priority number, date | US202063024168P | 13.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063024168 P | [2023/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021232038 | Date: | 18.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4149764 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/04, B41J2/125 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
G01N15/0227 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2/0456 (KR,US);
G01N15/1433 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2202/21 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2015/0294 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2015/1493 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2015/1497 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] | Title | German: | TRÖPFCHENMESSUNG MIT EINER GESTROBOSKOPTEN LED-QUELLE | [2023/12] | English: | DROPLET MEASUREMENT USING STROBED LED SOURCE | [2023/12] | French: | MESURE DE GOUTTELETTES À L'AIDE D'UNE SOURCE DE DEL SOUMISE À UN ÉCHANTILLONNAGE STROBOSCOPIQUE | [2023/12] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 08.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 30.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US8851600 (NAGASHIMA KANJI [JP]); | [Y]US9616661 (PIERIK ANKE [NL], et al); | [A]PL225757B (INST TELE- I RADIOTECHNICZNY [PL]); | [Y]US2017259560 (SREENIVASAN S V [US], et al); | [A]JP6368623B | International search | [Y]US2002140757 (TULLIS BARCLAY J [US], et al); | [Y]US2015273912 (DERLETH DAVID S [US], et al); | [Y]US2017259560 (SREENIVASAN S V [US], et al) |