EP4149528 - METHODS FOR BREAST CANCER TREATMENT AND PREDICTION OF THERAPEUTIC RESPONSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut d'Investigacions Biomédiques August Pi i Sunyer (IDIBAPS) Rosselló 149 - 153 08036 Barcelona / ES | For all designated states Hospital Clínic de Barcelona Villarroel 170 08036 Barcelona / ES | For all designated states Baylor College of Medicine One Baylor Plaza Houston, TX 77030 / US | For all designated states Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center 1275 York Avenue New York, NY 10065 / US | For all designated states Universitat de Barcelona Centro de Patentes de la UB C. Baldiri Reixac, 4 08028 Barcelona / ES | [2023/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHIFF, Rachel Houston, Texas 77030 / US | 02 /
RIMAWI, Mothaffar Houston, Texas 77030 / US | 03 /
VEERARAGHAVAN, Jamunarani Houston, Texas 77030 / US | 04 /
OSBORNE, C. Kent Houston, Texas 77030 / US | 05 /
GUTIERREZ, Carolina Houston, Texas 77030 / US | 06 /
HILSENBECK, Susan Houston, Texas 77030 / US | 07 /
PRAT, Aleix 08036 Barcelona / ES | 08 /
REIS-FILHO, Jorge New York, New York 10065 / US | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/12] | Application number, filing date | 21803871.9 | 12.05.2021 | [2023/12] | WO2021US70543 | Priority number, date | US202063023785P | 12.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063023785 P | [2023/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021232057 | Date: | 18.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4149528 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/517, A61K39/00, A61K39/395, A61K45/00, A61P35/00, A61P43/00, C07K16/28 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K31/517 (EP,US);
A61K31/4706 (US);
A61K31/506 (US);
A61K39/395 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C07K16/32 (US);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
G01N33/57415 (US);
G01N33/57484 (US);
C07K2317/24 (EP);
C07K2317/76 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/517, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K39/395, A61K2300/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2023/12] | A61K39/00, A61K39/395, A61K45/00, A61P35/00, A61P43/00, C07K16/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BRUSTKREBSBEHANDLUNG UND VORHERSAGE DER THERAPEUTISCHEN REAKTION | [2023/12] | English: | METHODS FOR BREAST CANCER TREATMENT AND PREDICTION OF THERAPEUTIC RESPONSE | [2023/12] | French: | MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER DU SEIN ET DE PRÉDICTION D'UNE RÉPONSE THÉRAPEUTIQUE | [2023/12] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 14.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2019338368 (PRAT APARICIO ALEIX [ES], et al); | International search | [Y]US2010008975 (AMLER LUKAS C [US], et al); | [A]WO2011146568 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al); | [A]US2018045727 (SPETZLER DAVID [US], et al); | [A]WO2020041684 (MEMORIAL SLOAN KETTERING CANCER CENTER [US]); |