EP4149962 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR INDUCING BROWN ADIPOGENESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Energesis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 700 Main Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2023/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREEMAN, Brian Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 02 /
BOSS, Olivier, D. Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Becker et Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [2023/12] | Application number, filing date | 21803999.8 | 11.05.2021 | [2023/12] | WO2021US31776 | Priority number, date | US202063022640P | 11.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063022640 P | [2023/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021231424 | Date: | 18.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4149962 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/495, A61K48/00, C07K14/51, A61K31/19, A61K31/41, A61K31/42, A61K31/38, A61P3/04, A61P3/08 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
A61K31/421 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/195 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/38 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/4174 (EP,IL,US);
A61P3/04 (EP,US);
A61P3/08 (EP,US);
A61K2300/00 (IL)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/195, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/38, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/4174, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/421, A61K2300/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2023/12] | C07K14/495, A61K48/00, C07K14/51 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR INDUZIERUNG VON BRAUNER ADIPOGENESE | [2023/12] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR INDUCING BROWN ADIPOGENESIS | [2023/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS POUR INDUIRE UNE ADIPOGENÈSE BRUNE | [2023/12] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 23.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2006069161 (LEE MARGARET S [US], et al); | [Y]US2008009537 (SAKAI YOSHIKI [JP]); | [Y]US2018344761 (OUDSHOORN BERENDINA [NL]) |