EP4150054 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS RELATED TO MEGAKARYOCYTE-DERIVED EXTRACELLULAR VESICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STRM.Bio Incorporated 251 River Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2023/12] | For all designated states Sterm.Bio Incorporated 251 River Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THON, Jonathan Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | Sagittarius IP Marlow International Parkway Marlow SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/12] | Sagittarius IP Marlow International Parkway Marlow, SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 21804213.3 | 11.05.2021 | [2023/12] | WO2021US31778 | Priority number, date | US202063022884P | 11.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063022884 P | US202063022888P | 11.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063022888 P | US202063022883P | 11.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063022883 P | US202163173732P | 12.04.2021 Original published format: US 202163173732 P | US202163173731P | 12.04.2021 Original published format: US 202163173731 P | US202163173725P | 12.04.2021 Original published format: US 202163173725 P | [2023/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021231425 | Date: | 18.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4150054 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/078, C12N5/0789, C07K14/71, A61K9/127 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
A61K9/0014 (EP);
A61K9/5068 (US);
A61K35/19 (EP,US);
A61K47/02 (EP);
A61K47/26 (EP);
A61K48/0033 (US);
A61K9/0019 (EP);
A61K9/0021 (EP);
A61K9/0043 (EP);
A61K9/06 (EP);
A61K9/08 (EP);
A61K9/12 (EP);
A61K9/127 (EP,US);
C12N13/00 (US);
C12N15/88 (EP);
C12N5/0644 (EP,US);
C12N9/22 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT EXTRAZELLULÄREN VESIKELN AUS MEGAKARYOZYTEN | [2023/12] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS RELATED TO MEGAKARYOCYTE-DERIVED EXTRACELLULAR VESICLES | [2023/12] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS RELATIFS AUX VÉSICULES EXTRACELLULAIRES DÉRIVÉES DES MÉGACARYOCYTES | [2023/12] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 17.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 28.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2017058262 (PAPOUTSAKIS ELEFTHERIOS [US], et al); | [A]US2018055891 (ZHAO YONG [US]); | [A]US2019202892 (LEWIS NURUDDEEN D [US], et al); |