EP4151221 - COMBINATION COMPRISING TRICYCLE COMPOUND AND USE THEREOF IN PREPARATION OF MEDICAMENT FOR TREATING HBV [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 06.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujian Akeylink Biotechnology Co., Ltd. 2F, Comprehensive Office Building Building 1-7, Fuyuan Industrial Zone Zherong County Ningde, Fujian 355300 / CN | [2023/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Wenqiang Ningde, Fujian 355300 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Dong Ningde, Fujian 355300 / CN | 03 /
MA, Zhiqiang Ningde, Fujian 355300 / CN | 04 /
ZHOU, Yixin Ningde, Fujian 355300 / CN | 05 /
MAO, John Ningde, Fujian 355300 / CN | 06 /
JIANG, Zhigan Shanghai 200131 / CN | 07 /
WANG, Jing Shanghai 200131 / CN | 08 /
HE, Haiying Shanghai 200131 / CN | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2023/12] | Application number, filing date | 21804833.8 | 14.05.2021 | [2023/12] | WO2021CN93769 | Priority number, date | CN202010412760 | 15.05.2020 Original published format: CN202010412760 | CN202011633373 | 31.12.2020 Original published format: CN202011633373 | [2023/12] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021228213 | Date: | 18.11.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4151221 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/55, A61K31/33, A61K31/395, A61K31/40, A61K31/5365, A61P1/16, A61P31/20 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61K31/554 (EP,US);
A61K31/513 (US);
A61K31/522 (EP,US);
A61K31/5365 (EP,US);
A61K31/553 (EP,US);
A61K31/675 (US);
A61K31/683 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P31/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/522, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/5365, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/553, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/554, A61K2300/00 (EP); |
Former IPC [2023/12] | A61K31/55, A61K31/33, A61K31/395, A61K31/40, A61K31/5365, C07D487/00, C07D471/04, C07D498/04, A61P1/16, A61P31/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] | Title | German: | KOMBINATION MIT EINER TRICYCLISCHEN VERBINDUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON BEI DER HERSTELLUNG EINES MEDIKAMENTS ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HBV | [2023/12] | English: | COMBINATION COMPRISING TRICYCLE COMPOUND AND USE THEREOF IN PREPARATION OF MEDICAMENT FOR TREATING HBV | [2023/12] | French: | COMBINAISON COMPRENANT UN COMPOSÉ TRICYCLIQUE ET SON UTILISATION DANS LA PRÉPARATION D'UN MÉDICAMENT POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU VHB | [2023/12] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2022 | Translation filed | 15.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 03.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP3587420 (FUJIAN COSUNTER PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 1-15 * Embodiment 85 * * paragraph [0558] - paragraph [0560] *; | [Y]EP3590942 (FUJIAN COSUNTER PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [CN], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claim 1 *; | [Y]EP3632914 (FUJIAN COSUNTER PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [CN], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claim 1 * * Test embodiment 7 *; | [Y] - AZIZ MUNEBA ET AL, "Predictors of Therapeutic Outcome to Nucleotide Reverse Transcriptase Inhibitor in Hepatitis B Patients", VIRAL IMMUNOLOGY, (201811), vol. 31, no. 9, ISSN 0882-8245, pages 632 - 638, XP093089667 [Y] 1-15 * page 632, abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/vim.2018.0022 | [Y] - YANG L ET AL, "Identification and Characterization of Pyrimidinediones as Potent Non-nucleoside Reverse Transcriptase Inhibitors of Hepatitis B virus", ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 82, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.ANTIVIRAL.2009.02.058, ISSN 0166-3542, (20090501), page A32, (20090501), XP026193219 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.antiviral.2009.02.058 | International search | [A]CN102060786 (UNIV TIANJIN) [A] 1-32 * entire document *; | [A]CN105102451 (JANSSEN R & D IRELAND) [A] 1-32 * entire document *; | [A]CN106255684 (NOVIRA THERAPEUTICS INC) [A] 1-32 * entire document *; | [A]CN106459032 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE) [A] 1-32* entire document *; | [Y]WO2018153285 (FUJIAN COSUNTER PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [CN], et al) [Y] 1-32 * claims 1, 14 and 17 *; | [Y]WO2018161960 (FUJIAN COSUNTER PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [CN], et al) [Y] 1-32 * claims 1, 20-21, 23 *; | [Y]WO2018214875 (FUJIAN COSUNTER PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [CN], et al) [Y] 1-32 * claims 1, 16, 19-20 *; | [A]WO2020038456 (FUJIAN COSUNTER PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-32 * entire document *; | [Y] - WANG Hong-liang; LIU Xia-ling; CAO Shuang, "Anti-Hepatitis B Virus Drugs: Research Advances", Journal of International Pharmaceutical Research, CN , (20160229), vol. 43, no. 1, doi:10.13220/j.cnki.jipr.2016.01.020, pages 134 - 138, XP009531790 [Y] 1-32 * pp. 134-138 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.13220/j.cnki.jipr.2016.01.020 | by applicant | WO2018153285 | WO2018161960 | WO2018214875 |