EP4149431 - GELLING SOLUTIONS FOR ADMINISTRATION OF COMPOUNDS TO THE INNER EAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spiral Therapeutics Inc. 6000 Shoreline Ct, Suite 206 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2023/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE JUAN, Eugene South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 02 /
ERICKSON, Signe South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 03 /
AYOOB, Andrew South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 04 /
FARINAS, Kathleen South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [2023/12] | Application number, filing date | 21804971.6 | 12.05.2021 | [2023/12] | WO2021US31977 | Priority number, date | US202063024232P | 13.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063024232 P | [2023/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021231563 | Date: | 18.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4149431 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K9/06, A61K9/127, A61K9/14, A61K9/16, A61K38/00, A61K31/573, A61K47/34, A61P27/16 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
A61K9/0046 (EP,US);
C08L71/00 (US);
A61K31/573 (EP,US);
A61K47/34 (EP);
A61K9/06 (EP,US);
A61P27/16 (EP,US);
C08L77/04 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/12] | A61K9/00, A61K9/06, A61K9/127, A61K9/14, A61K9/16, A61K38/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] | Title | German: | GELBILDENDE LÖSUNGEN ZUR VERABREICHUNG VON VERBINDUNGEN IN DAS INNENOHR | [2023/12] | English: | GELLING SOLUTIONS FOR ADMINISTRATION OF COMPOUNDS TO THE INNER EAR | [2023/12] | French: | SOLUTIONS GÉLIFIANTES POUR L'ADMINISTRATION DE COMPOSÉS À L'OREILLE INTERNE | [2023/12] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 28.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP2196193 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US]); | [Y]EP2247645 (HYPERBRANCH MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY [US]) | International search | [A]WO02062276 (INCEPT LLC [US]) [A] 1-3, 30-33 * entire document *; | [A]US2005147643 (HUNTER WILLIAM L [CA], et al) [A] 1-3, 30-33 * entire document *; | [Y]WO2006135479 (ANGIOTECH INT AG [CH], et al) [Y] 30-33 * entire document *; | [XY]US2007196454 (STOCKMAN KENNETH E [US], et al) [X] 2 * entire document * [Y] 1,3; | [A]US2010015263 (LICHTER JAY [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 30-33 * entire document *; | [Y]WO2010011609 (OTONOMY INC [US], et al) [Y] 1, 3, 30-33 * entire document *; | [Y]EP2386290 (CONFLUENT SURGICAL INC [US]) [Y] 33 * entire document *; | [A]US2013345334 (HOOGENBOOM RICHARD [NL], et al) [A] 1-3, 30-33 * entire document *; | [A]US10561736 (HERRERO CARMEN [ES], et al) [A] 1-3, 30-33 * entire document *; | [PA]US2020214976 (HERRERO CARMEN [ES], et al) [PA] 1-3, 30-33* entire document * |