EP4225757 - A PROCESS TOWARD THE MANUFACTURE OF (6R,10S)-10-{4-[5-CHLORO-2-(4-CHLORO-1H-1,2,3-TRIAZOL-1-YL)PHENYL]-6-OXO-1(6H)-PYRIMIDINYL}-1-(DIFLUOROMETHYL)-6-METHYL-1,4,7,8,9,10-HEXAHYDRO-11,15-(METHENO)PYRAZOLO[4,3-B] [1,7]DIAZACYCLOTETRADECIN-5(6H)-ONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | For all designated states JANSSEN Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [2023/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUKHERJEE, Subha Princeton, New Jersey 08543 / US | 02 /
GALLAGHER, William P. Princeton, New Jersey 08543 / US | 03 /
JAMISON, Christopher Robert Princeton, New Jersey 08543 / US | 04 /
WEI, Carolyn S. Belle Mead, New Jersey 08543 / US | 05 /
KOLOTUCHIN, Sergei Princeton, New Jersey 08543 / US | 06 /
SINGH, Amarjit Highland Park, New Jersey 08904 / US | 07 /
CUNIERE, Nicolas Princeton, New Jersey 08543 / US | 08 /
SFOUGGATAKIS, Chris Princeton, New Jersey 08543 / US | 09 /
ORTIZ, Adrian Oak Park, California 91377 / US | 10 /
WISNIEWSKI, Steven R. Princeton, New Jersey 08543 / US | 11 /
ZHENG, Bin Princeton, New Jersey 08543 / US | 12 /
LUO, Helen Y. San Francisco, California 94117 / US | 13 /
LEMAIRE, Sébastien François Emmanuel 2340 Beerse / BE | 14 /
BEN HAÏM, Cyril 2340 Beerse / BE | 15 /
CHERNICHENKO, Kostiantyn 2340 Beerse / BE | 16 /
BROGGINI, Diego Fernando Domenico 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | 17 /
WAGSCHAL, Simon Albert 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | 18 /
CAO, Duy Chi Trung 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | 19 /
REUTER, Karl 79194 Gundelfingen / DE | 20 /
SCHMALZBAUER, Björn 79183 Waldkirch / DE | 21 /
KOSCHKER, Philipp 79111 Freiburg / DE | 22 /
EASTGATE, Martin D. Princeton, New Jersey 08543 / US | 23 /
SKLIAR, Dimitri Princeton, New Jersey 08543 / US | 24 /
ZHDANKO, Alexander 2340 Beerse / BE | 25 /
XIOURAS, Christos 2340 Beerse / BE | 26 /
MOWER, Matthew Penfield 2340 Beerse / BE | 27 /
TRAN, Ngoc Duc 2340 Beerse / BE | 28 /
RAHMANI, Ramdane 2340 Beerse / BE | 29 /
JUSSEAU, Xavier Jean-Marie 2340 Beerse / BE | 30 /
MATCHA, Kiran 2340 Beerse / BE | 31 /
PEREGO, Luca Alessandro 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | [2023/33] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2023/33] | Application number, filing date | 21805719.8 | 11.10.2021 | [2023/33] | WO2021US54413 | Priority number, date | US202063090558P | 12.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063090558 P | [2023/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022081473 | Date: | 21.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4225757 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/18, C07D213/61, C07D249/06, C07B57/00 | [2023/33] | CPC: |
C07D471/18 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D471/16 (US);
A61K31/513 (KR);
B01J23/72 (US);
C07D213/61 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D249/06 (EP,IL,KR);
C07B2200/13 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON (6R,10S)-10-{4-(5-CHLOR-2-(4-CHLOR-1H-1,2,3-TRIAZOL-1-YL)PHENYL)-6-OXO-1(6H)-PYRIMIDINYL}-1-(DIFLUORMETHYL)-6-METHYL-1,4,7,10-HEXAHYDRO-11,15-(METHENOPYRAZOLO [1,4 | [2023/33] | English: | A PROCESS TOWARD THE MANUFACTURE OF (6R,10S)-10-{4-[5-CHLORO-2-(4-CHLORO-1H-1,2,3-TRIAZOL-1-YL)PHENYL]-6-OXO-1(6H)-PYRIMIDINYL}-1-(DIFLUOROMETHYL)-6-METHYL-1,4,7,8,9,10-HEXAHYDRO-11,15-(METHENO)PYRAZOLO[4,3-B] [1,7]DIAZACYCLOTETRADECIN-5(6H)-ONE | [2023/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE (6R,10S)-10-{4-[5-CHLORO-2-(4-CHLORO-1H-1,2,3-TRIAZOL-1-YL)PHÉNYL]-6-OXO-1(6H)-PYRIMIDINYL}-1-(DIFLUOROMÉTHYL)-6-MÉTHYL-1,4,7,8,9,10-HEXAHYDRO-11,15-(METHENO)PYRAZOLO[4,3-B][1,7]DIAZACYCLOTÉTRADÉCIN-5(6H)-ONE | [2023/33] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/33] | 11.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US2016096839 (DILGER ANDREW K [US], et al); | [A]WO2016053455 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]); | [AP]WO2020210613 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US], et al) | by applicant | US9453018 |