EP4211521 - AUTOMATICALLY GENERATING TRAINING DATA OF A TIME SERIES OF SENSOR DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.05.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2023/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GÜNNEMANN-GHOLIZADEH, Nikou 80336 München / DE | 02 /
GALABOV, Filip 80807 München / DE | [2023/29] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2023/29] | Application number, filing date | 21805857.6 | 27.10.2021 | [2023/29] | WO2021EP79752 | Priority number, date | EP20200204678 | 29.10.2020 Original published format: EP 20204678 | [2023/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022090275 | Date: | 05.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4211521 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4211521 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02, G06N20/00 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
G05B23/0221 (EP);
G06N5/022 (US);
G05B23/0245 (US);
G06N20/00 (EP);
G05B2219/33002 (EP);
G05B2219/33034 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE ERZEUGUNG VON TRAININGSDATEN AUS ZEITREIHEN VON SENSORDATEN | [2023/29] | English: | AUTOMATICALLY GENERATING TRAINING DATA OF A TIME SERIES OF SENSOR DATA | [2023/29] | French: | GÉNÉRATION AUTOMATIQUE DE DONNÉES D'APPRENTISSAGE D'UNE SÉRIE TEMPORELLE DE DONNÉES DE CAPTEUR | [2024/05] |
Former [2023/29] | GÉNÉRATION AUTOMATIQUE DE DONNÉES D'APPRENTISSAGE D'UNE SÉRIE CHRONOLOGIQUE DE DONNÉES DE CAPTEUR | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/29] | 13.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 15.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004260521 (AGGARWAL CHARU C [US]); | [A]EP2916260 (TATA CONSULTANCY SERVICES LTD [IN]); | [A]US2017184643 (HOMMA KOSUKE [JP], et al); | [A]EP3706047 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | by applicant | US2017184643 | EP3671576 | EP3706048 |