EP4260011 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE RANGE OF A BATTERY-OPERATED MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Brieffach 1770 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | [2023/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRUHS, Stefan 38118 Braunschweig / DE | 02 /
NEUMANN, Markus 38533 Vordorf / DE | 03 /
KRIEGER, Wjatscheslaw 10115 Berlin / DE | 04 /
EISNER, Ann-Kathrin 38550 Isenbüttel / DE | 05 /
WURM, Christian 13597 Berlin / DE | [2023/42] | Application number, filing date | 21806209.9 | 04.11.2021 | [2023/42] | WO2021EP80604 | Priority number, date | DE202010215678 | 10.12.2020 Original published format: DE102020215678 | [2023/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022122258 | Date: | 16.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4260011 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/34, G01C21/36, B60L58/13 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
G01C21/3415 (EP);
G01C21/3469 (EP,US);
B60L58/12 (US);
B60L58/13 (EP);
G01C21/343 (EP);
G01C21/3484 (EP);
G01C21/3664 (EP);
G01C21/367 (EP);
G01C21/3697 (EP);
B60L2260/52 (EP);
B60L2260/54 (EP);
B60L53/62 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR REICHWEITENKONTROLLE FÜR EIN BATTERIEBETRIEBENES KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2023/42] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE RANGE OF A BATTERY-OPERATED MOTOR VEHICLE | [2023/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR COMMANDER L'AUTONOMIE D'UN VÉHICULE À MOTEUR SUR BATTERIE | [2023/42] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/42] | 10.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE102010040125 (DENSO CORP [JP]); | [Y]US2017030728 (BAGLINO ANDREW D [US], et al); | [Y]DE102018203392 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [Y]DE102018209997 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]); | [Y]DE102018215722 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]); | [Y]DE102019101094 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) | by applicant | DE10195107 | DE102008035460 | DE102013216635 | US2016363456 | US2017030728 | DE102016217087 | US2019186932 | DE102019204217 | DE102019130058 |