EP4229917 - METHODS FOR POWER EFFICIENT BROADCASTING IN WLAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital Patent Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway, Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [2023/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Xiaofei New York, New York 10120 / US | 02 /
LOU, Hanqing New York, New York 10120 / US | 03 /
SUN, Li Hsiang San Diego, California 92128 / US | 04 /
LEVY, Joseph New York, New York 10120 / US | [2023/34] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [2023/34] | Application number, filing date | 21806900.3 | 19.10.2021 | [2023/34] | WO2021US55597 | Priority number, date | US202063093588P | 19.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063093588 P | US202163181752P | 29.04.2021 Original published format: US 202163181752 P | [2023/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022086952 | Date: | 28.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4229917 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/12 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
H04W48/12 (EP);
H04W4/06 (EP,US);
H04W72/12 (US);
H04W84/12 (EP);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR LEISTUNGSEFFIZIENTES RUNDSENDEN IN EINEM WLAN | [2023/34] | English: | METHODS FOR POWER EFFICIENT BROADCASTING IN WLAN | [2023/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE DIFFUSION ÉCOÉNERGÉTIQUE DANS UN RÉSEAU LOCAL SANS FIL | [2023/34] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/34] | 19.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.09.2024 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | Divisional application(s) | EP24182200.6 / EP4412311 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2018352397 (CARIOU LAURENT [US], et al); | [XP]WO2021158950 (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS INC [US]); |