EP4232899 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SECURE CONCURRENT STREAMING OF APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meta Platforms, Inc. 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLARK, Christopher Wickersham Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Qunshu Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | 03 /
MENENDEZ, Carlos Lopez Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | 04 /
GUARDIOLA, Francisco Javier Merino Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | 05 /
OKAMOTO, Jacob Matthew Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | 06 /
OU, Yangpeng Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | 07 /
GOWDA, Puttaswamy Rahul Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | 08 /
ZHU, Xiaoxing Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/35] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 21807458.1 | 23.10.2021 | [2023/35] | WO2021US56387 | Priority number, date | US202063105320P | 25.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063105320 P | US202163194821P | 28.05.2021 Original published format: US 202163194821 P | US202117507303 | 21.10.2021 Original published format: US202117507303 | [2023/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022087514 | Date: | 28.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4232899 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
G06F9/5072 (EP);
A63F13/355 (EP,US);
A63F13/352 (EP,US);
A63F13/40 (US);
A63F13/48 (EP,US);
A63F13/49 (EP,US);
A63F13/50 (EP);
A63F13/60 (EP);
A63F13/79 (US);
G06F16/16 (US);
G06F16/182 (US);
G06F9/452 (EP);
G06F9/455 (EP);
G06F9/45558 (EP,US);
G06F9/461 (EP);
G06F9/4856 (EP);
H04L61/5007 (EP);
H04L65/612 (US);
H04L65/65 (US);
H04L67/01 (US);
H04L67/10 (EP,US);
H04L67/1097 (US);
H04L67/131 (US);
H04L67/141 (US);
H04L67/142 (EP);
H04L67/145 (EP,US);
H04L67/306 (US);
H04L67/34 (EP);
H04L67/568 (US);
A63F2300/538 (US);
A63F2300/5546 (US);
A63F2300/636 (US);
G06F2009/45566 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR SICHERES GLEICHZEITIGES STREAMING VON ANWENDUNGEN | [2023/35] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR SECURE CONCURRENT STREAMING OF APPLICATIONS | [2023/35] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR DIFFUSION CONTINUE SIMULTANÉE SÉCURISÉE D'APPLICATIONS | [2023/35] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | 24.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.08.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/38] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |