Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
21.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.04.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
27.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
27.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
21.07.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] |
21.07.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] |
23.05.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.02.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.03.2023 [2023/13] |
24.02.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.03.2023 [2023/13] |
30.01.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.01.2023 | Change - representative | |
29.11.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.11.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
21.11.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.11.2022 | Change - representative | |
18.11.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.01.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
26.11.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.11.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor |