Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11782381 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2023 | B2 | US2023195028 | 22.06.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021JP18218 | 13.05.2021 | JP2020088324 | 20.05.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7294534B | Global Dossier | 20.06.2023 | B2 | JPWO2021235315 | 25.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021JP18218 | 13.05.2021 | JP2020088324 | 20.05.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115668069 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021JP18218 | 13.05.2021 | JP2020088324 | 20.05.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4155832 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2024 | A4 | EP4155832 | 29.03.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021JP18218 | 13.05.2021 | JP2020088324 | 20.05.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021235315 | Global Dossier | 25.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2020088324 | 20.05.2020 |