EP4153357 - DEVICES, ASSAYS AND METHODS FOR DETECTION OF NUCLEIC ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mammoth Biosciences, Inc. 1000 Marina Boulevard Suite 600 Brisbane CA 94005 / US | [2023/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSALOGLOU, Maria-Nefeli Brisbane, California 94005 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Janice Sha Brisbane, California 94005 / US | 03 /
BROUGHTON, James Paul Brisbane, California 94005 / US | 04 /
DRZAL, Daniel Thomas Brisbane, California 94005 / US | 05 /
SHAPIRO, Sarah Jane Brisbane, California 94005 / US | 06 /
FASCHING, Clare Louise Brisbane, California 94005 / US | 07 /
HENDRIKS, Carley Gelenter Brisbane, California 94005 / US | 08 /
CHING, Jesus Brisbane, California 94005 / US | 09 /
JAIN, Sonal Brisbane, California 94005 / US | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2023/13] | Application number, filing date | 21809137.9 | 19.05.2021 | [2023/13] | WO2021US33271 | Priority number, date | US202063027309P | 19.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063027309 P | US202063113799P | 13.11.2020 Original published format: US 202063113799 P | US202063114977P | 17.11.2020 Original published format: US 202063114977 P | US202163181131P | 28.04.2021 Original published format: US 202163181131 P | [2023/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021236850 | Date: | 25.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4153357 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, B01L7/00 | [2023/13] | CPC: |
B01L3/5023 (EP,US);
G01N33/5308 (US);
B01L2200/16 (EP);
B01L2300/069 (US);
B01L2300/0825 (EP);
B01L2400/0478 (EP);
B01L2400/06 (US);
B01L3/5029 (EP);
B01L7/52 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6813, C12Q2521/301, C12Q2525/301, C12Q2563/107, C12Q2565/30, C12Q2565/625 (EP);
C12Q1/6823, C12Q2521/301, C12Q2525/301, C12Q2563/107, C12Q2565/625 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN, TESTS UND VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS VON NUKLEINSÄUREN | [2023/13] | English: | DEVICES, ASSAYS AND METHODS FOR DETECTION OF NUCLEIC ACIDS | [2023/13] | French: | DISPOSITIFS, DOSAGES ET MÉTHODES DE DÉTECTION D'ACIDES NUCLÉIQUES | [2023/13] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 16.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 13.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010035349 (BAU HAIM H [US], et al); | [A]WO2011051735 (SEC DEP FOR ENVIRONMENT FOOD & RURAL AFFAIRS [GB], et al); | [A]US2018304260 (THOMAS DONALD J [US], et al); | [X]WO2020028729 (MAMMOTH BIOSCIENCES INC [US], et al) | International search | [A]WO2019071051 (BROAD INST INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2020028729 (MAMMOTH BIOSCIENCES INC [US], et al); |