EP4240298 - PHACOEMULSIFICATION PROBE STROKE LENGTH MAXIMIZATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Surgical Vision, Inc. 31 Technology Drive, Suite 200 Irvine, CA 92618 / US | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLINER, Vadim 2066717 Yokneam / IL | [2023/37] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2023/37] | Application number, filing date | 21810722.5 | 26.10.2021 | [2023/37] | WO2021IB59880 | Priority number, date | US202017087665 | 03.11.2020 Original published format: US202017087665 | [2023/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022096983 | Date: | 12.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4240298 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61F9/007 | [2023/37] | CPC: |
A61F9/00745 (EP,US);
A61B90/06 (US);
A61B2017/00402 (US);
A61B2217/007 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/37] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR MAXIMIERUNG DER SCHLAGLÄNGE EINER PHAKOEMULSIFIKATIONSSONDE | [2023/37] | English: | PHACOEMULSIFICATION PROBE STROKE LENGTH MAXIMIZATION SYSTEM | [2023/37] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MAXIMISATION DE LONGUEUR DE COURSE DE SONDE DE PHACOÉMULSIFICATION | [2023/37] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/37] | 02.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0424685 (STORZ INSTR CO [US]) [A] 1-11 * column 7, paragraph 4 - column 8, paragraph 1 *; | [A]US2005209621 (GORDON RAPHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0044] *; | [A]US2010160852 (MOORE JR THOMAS G [US]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0014] - [0016] - [0 24] - [0028]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2013314077 (OKADA KUNITAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1* paragraph [0019] *; | [A]US2019365567 (BALKENBUSH CASEY [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0246] *; | [A]WO2020160434 (ZEISS CARL MEDITEC INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0191] * | by applicant | US5843109 | US6852092 | US7169123 |