EP4232784 - TEMPERATURE MONITORING WITH A THERMAL CAMERA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.05.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADDISON, Paul S. Midlothian Lothian EH26 0PJ / GB | 02 /
SMIT, Philip C. Midlothian Lothian EH26 0PJ / GB | 03 /
ADDISON, Anthony P. Midlothian Lothian EH26 0PJ / GB | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/35] | Hargreaves, Timothy Edward Marks & Clerk LLP 40 Torphichen Street Edinburgh EH3 8JB / GB | Application number, filing date | 21811217.5 | 22.10.2021 | [2023/35] | WO2021US71993 | Priority number, date | US202017080506 | 26.10.2020 Original published format: US202017080506 | [2023/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022094533 | Date: | 05.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4232784 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01J5/00, G01J5/02, G01J5/80, A61B5/01 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
G01J5/0025 (EP);
G06T7/0012 (US);
A61B5/0035 (EP);
A61B5/0037 (EP);
A61B5/0077 (EP);
A61B5/01 (EP);
A61B5/015 (EP);
G01J5/0275 (EP);
G01J5/80 (EP);
G06T7/90 (US);
G16H10/60 (US);
G16H40/67 (US);
G16H50/20 (US);
G16H50/30 (US);
G01J2005/0077 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] | Title | German: | TEMPERATURÜBERWACHUNG MIT EINER THERMOKAMERA | [2023/35] | English: | TEMPERATURE MONITORING WITH A THERMAL CAMERA | [2023/35] | French: | SURVEILLANCE DE TEMPÉRATURE AVEC UNE CAMÉRA THERMIQUE | [2023/35] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | 25.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2013235901 (SHIN JAE-WOO [KR]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0096] , [0 97]; figures 1, 3 * [I] 2-10; | [I]US2016073890 (KHACHATURIAN MARK [US], et al) [I] 1 * paragraph [0144] - paragraph [0175] *; | [XYI]US2020105407 (SOREEFAN IBNE [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,10 * figures 1,6 * [Y] 8,9 [I] 2,6,7; | [IY]WO2020146596 (UNIV MICHIGAN REGENTS [US]) [I] 11-15 * figure 1 * [Y] 8,9; | [A]CN111579083 (ROKID TECH HANGZHOU CO LTD) [A] 11* figure 1; claim 4 * |