EP4244720 - TECHNIQUES FOR MODIFYING CLUSTER COMPUTING ENVIRONMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oracle International Corporation 500 Oracle Parkway Redwood Shores, California 94065 / US | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKINAPELLI, Sandeep Redwood Shores, California 94065 / US | 02 /
DAS, Devaraj Redwood Shores, California 94065 / US | 03 /
KAVALI, Devarajulu Redwood Shores, California 94065 / US | 04 /
JAISWAL, Puneet Redwood Shores, California 94065 / US | 05 /
RADANOVIC, Velimir Redwood Shores, California 94065 / US | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 21811590.5 | 26.10.2021 | [2023/38] | WO2021US56659 | Priority number, date | US202017094715 | 10.11.2020 Original published format: US202017094715 | [2023/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022103575 | Date: | 19.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4244720 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50 | [2023/38] | CPC: |
G06F9/5027 (EP);
G06F9/505 (US);
G06F11/3433 (US);
G06F18/214 (US);
G06F9/5072 (EP);
G06F9/5083 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MODIFIZIERUNG VON CLUSTER-COMPUTING-UMGEBUNGEN | [2023/38] | English: | TECHNIQUES FOR MODIFYING CLUSTER COMPUTING ENVIRONMENTS | [2023/38] | French: | TECHNIQUES DE MODIFICATION D'ENVIRONNEMENTS INFORMATIQUES EN GRAPPE | [2023/38] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | 09.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US8260840 (SIROTA PETER [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2016094401 (ANWAR ALI [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2016323377 (EINKAUF JONATHAN DALY [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2018060744 (ACHIN JEREMY [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [XI]WO2019104052 (AMAZON TECH INC [US]) [X] 1,3-5,8,9,11,12,15,17,18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0021] - [0022] - [0028] - [0032] - [0043] , [0048] - [0051] - [0055] - [0057] * * figures 1-2 * [I] 2,6,7,10,13,14,16,19,20; | [A]CN110046048 (UNIV HANGZHOU DIANZI) [A] 1-20* abstract *; | [XI]US2020171382 (AGOSTON STEVE [US]) [X] 1,3-9,11-15,17-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0008] - [0027] - [0031] - [0037] - [0038] - [0047] - [0053] * * figures 1,3 * [I] 2,10,16; | [XI]US2020285503 (DOU YIPING [US], et al) [X] 1,9,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0012] - [0018] - [0023] - [0024] - [0027] - [0029] - [0044] - [0048] * * figures 2-3 * [I] 2-8,10-14,16-20 |