EP4159703 - SILICON NITRIDE SINTERED BODY, WEAR-RESISTANT MEMBER USING SAME, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SILICON NITRIDE SINTERED BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0023 / JP | For all designated states Toshiba Materials Co., Ltd. 8, Shinsugita-Cho Isogo-Ku Yokohama-Shi Kanagawa 235-0032 / JP | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUNAKI, Kai Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 235-0032 / JP | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 21811913.9 | 25.05.2021 | [2023/14] | WO2021JP19816 | Priority number, date | JP20200091162 | 26.05.2020 Original published format: JP 2020091162 | [2023/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021241583 | Date: | 02.12.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4159703 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/587, B23B27/14, F16C33/32, C04B35/638, C04B35/645, C04B35/593 | [2024/28] | CPC: |
C04B35/593 (EP);
C04B35/587 (US);
C04B35/62695 (US);
C04B35/638 (EP);
C04B35/64 (US);
C04B35/645 (EP);
F16C33/32 (EP);
C04B2235/3873 (US);
C04B2235/3878 (EP);
C04B2235/5445 (EP);
C04B2235/6567 (EP);
C04B2235/6586 (EP);
C04B2235/661 (EP);
C04B2235/72 (EP);
C04B2235/723 (EP);
C04B2235/786 (EP,US);
C04B2235/788 (EP);
C04B2235/87 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/14] | C04B35/587, B23B27/14, F16C33/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Title | German: | SILICIUMNITRID-SINTERKÖRPER, VERSCHLEISSFESTES ELEMENT DAMIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SILICIUMNITRID-SINTERKÖRPERS | [2023/14] | English: | SILICON NITRIDE SINTERED BODY, WEAR-RESISTANT MEMBER USING SAME, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SILICON NITRIDE SINTERED BODY | [2023/14] | French: | CORPS FRITTÉ DE NITRURE DE SILICIUM, ÉLÉMENT RÉSISTANT À L'USURE L'UTILISANT, ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION, ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CORPS FRITTÉ DE NITRURE DE SILICIUM | [2023/14] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2022 | Translation filed | 25.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05170547 (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK); | [X]JP2006036554 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al); | [X]CN106518089 (MAT INST CHINA ACAD ENG PHYSICS) | International search | [X]JP2011016716 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al); | [A]WO2011102298 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al); | [X]JP2014073944 (HITACHI METALS LTD); | [X]JP2014073945 (HITACHI METALS LTD) | by applicant | JPH0251206 | JPH0977560 | JPH09157031 | JPH09235165 | JP2002053376 |