EP4159636 - CAN LID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daiwa Can Company 2-7-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-7009 / JP | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIOTANI, Masahiro Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 252-5183 / JP | 02 /
MIYASHITA, Rio Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 252-5183 / JP | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 21812650.6 | 26.05.2021 | [2023/14] | WO2021JP20028 | Priority number, date | JP20200092838 | 28.05.2020 Original published format: JP 2020092838 | [2023/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021241639 | Date: | 02.12.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4159636 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B65D17/40, B65D17/34, B65D17/28 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
B65D17/40 (EP,US);
B65D17/34 (EP);
B65D17/347 (EP,US);
B65D17/353 (EP);
B65D17/4011 (EP);
B65D2203/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/14] | B65D17/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Title | German: | DOSENDECKEL | [2023/14] | English: | CAN LID | [2023/14] | French: | COUVERCLE DE CANETTE | [2023/14] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2022 | Translation filed | 02.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 02.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CH517025 (HOFFMANN AG GEB [CH]); | [XI]US4848623 (SAUNDERS WILLIAM T [US], et al); | [XI]US8177092 (MILLS GARY HILAIRE [GB]) | International search | [XY]JPS5294291 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD); | [XY]JP2007308142 (HOKKAI CAN, et al); | [A]US2008067171 (HEINICKE PAUL R [US]) | by applicant | JPH02502814 | JP2012131518 |