Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023089136 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202010460837 | 27.05.2020 | WO2021CN88575 | 21.04.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023527008 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202010460837 | 27.05.2020 | WO2021CN88575 | 21.04.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4145487 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2023 | A4 | EP4145487 | 08.03.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202010460837 | 27.05.2020 | WO2021CN88575 | 21.04.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021238509 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2022 | A8 | WO2021238509 | 02.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202010460837 | 27.05.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112038039B | Global Dossier | 24.08.2021 | B | CN112038039 | 04.12.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202010460837 | 27.05.2020 |