EP4145487 - MAGNETIC FIELD GENERATION DEVICE, AND TRANSMISSION ELECTRON MICROSCOPE SAMPLE HOLDER CAPABLE OF APPLYING MAGNETIC FIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ningbo Institute of Materials Technology & Engineering, Chinese Academy of Sciences Zhuangshi Road 519 Zhenhai District Ningbo, Zhejiang 315201 / CN | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIA, Weixing Ningbo, Zhejiang 315201 / CN | 02 /
BAI, Tian Ningbo, Zhejiang 315201 / CN | 03 /
SUN, Xin Ningbo, Zhejiang 315201 / CN | 04 /
QIN, Jiazhuan Ningbo, Zhejiang 315201 / CN | 05 /
CHEN, Renjie Ningbo, Zhejiang 315201 / CN | 06 /
YAN, Aru Ningbo, Zhejiang 315201 / CN | 07 /
LI, Wei Ningbo, Zhejiang 315201 / CN | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 21813253.8 | 21.04.2021 | [2023/10] | WO2021CN88575 | Priority number, date | CN202010460837 | 27.05.2020 Original published format: CN202010460837 | [2023/10] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021238509 | Date: | 02.12.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4145487 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/20, H01J37/09, H01F7/20, H01J37/26, G01N23/02, G01N23/20025 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
H01F7/20 (EP,CN);
H01J37/20 (EP,US);
G01N23/04 (CN);
G01N23/20008 (CN);
G01N23/20025 (EP,CN);
G01N23/2251 (EP);
H01F6/06 (US);
H01J37/261 (US);
H01J37/266 (EP);
H01J2237/2008 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/10] | H01J37/20, H01J37/09, H01F7/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Title | German: | MAGNETFELDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND PROBENHALTER FÜR EIN TRANSMISSIONSELEKTRONENMIKROSKOP ZUR ANWENDUNG EINES MAGNETFELDES | [2023/10] | English: | MAGNETIC FIELD GENERATION DEVICE, AND TRANSMISSION ELECTRON MICROSCOPE SAMPLE HOLDER CAPABLE OF APPLYING MAGNETIC FIELD | [2023/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION DE CHAMP MAGNÉTIQUE, ET TIGE D'ÉCHANTILLON DE MICROSCOPE ÉLECTRONIQUE EN TRANSMISSION PERMETTANT L'APPLICATION D'UN CHAMP MAGNÉTIQUE | [2023/10] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2022 | Translation filed | 30.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 27.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH08264146 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 12,13 * figures 1a, 1b, 2 *; | [YD]US2004061066 (HARADA KEN [JP], et al) [YD] 9,11 * paragraph [0153] *; | [A]EP2835688 (CHINESE ACAD PHYSICS INST [CN]) [A] 1-15* figures 4A,4B *; | [A]EP2797099 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * figures 3-9 *; | [A]CN108183059 (NINGBO INST MATERIALS TECH & ENG CAS) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,2,9,10 *; | [IY] - SUGAWARA AKIRA ET AL, "A 0.5-T pure-in-plane-field magnetizing holder for in-situ Lorentz microscopy", ULTRAMICROSCOPY, NL, (20190201), vol. 197, doi:10.1016/j.ultramic.2018.11.012, ISSN 0304-3991, pages 105 - 111, XP055913916 [I] 1-5,7,8,10 * abstract * * Legend of figure 1;; figure 1(a); table 1 * * page 106, column left, line 42 * * page 106, column left, lines 24-29 * [Y] 9,11-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ultramic.2018.11.012 | International search | [X]JPH08264146 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-16 * description, paragraphs 2-28, and figures 1-5 *; | [A]CN102820196 (CHINESE ACAD PHYSICS INST) [A] 1-16 * entire document *; | [X]EP2797099 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1-16 * description, paragraphs 13-39, and figures 1-9 *; | [A]CN104916516 (UNIV LANZHOU) [A] 1-16* entire document *; | [PX]CN112038039 (NINGBO INST MATERIALS TECH & ENG CAS) [PX] 1-16 * description, paragraphs 11-74, and figures 1-15 * | by applicant | US2004061066 | US2005274889 | US8158940 | US9070532 | - INOUE et al., "JEOL developed a magnetic specimen stage", Journal of Electron Microscopy, (20050000), vol. 54, no. 2005, page 509 | - UHLIG et al., Ultramicroscopy, (20030000), vol. 94, page 193 | - M. ARITA et al., Materials Transactions, (20140000), vol. 55, page 403 | - G. YI et al., Ultramicroscopy, (20040000), vol. 99, page 65 | - HAIHUA LIU et al., "Institute of Physics of Chinese Academy of Sciences designed and manufactured an in-situ single-tilt sample holder", Journal of Chinese Electron Microscopy Society, (20110000), vol. 30, page 97 | - XIN'AN YANG et al., Journal of Chinese Electron Microscopy Society, (20130000), vol. 32, page 416 | - AKIRA SUGAWARA et al., Ultramicroscopy, (20190000), vol. 197, page 105 |