EP4159919 - HEAT-SEALABLE PAPER AND PACKAGING BAG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oji Holdings Corporation 7-5, Ginza 4-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISOZAKI, Tomofumi Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | 02 /
NOISHIKI, Yasutomo Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | 03 /
TSURUHARA, Masahiro Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | 04 /
SHAMOTO, Yuta Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | 05 /
TANAKA, Miyoko Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Godemeyer Blum Lenze Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB - werkpatent An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 21813508.5 | 21.05.2021 | [2023/14] | WO2021JP19315 | Priority number, date | JP20200091869 | 27.05.2020 Original published format: JP 2020091869 | JP20200217000 | 25.12.2020 Original published format: JP 2020217000 | [2023/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021241427 | Date: | 02.12.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4159919 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | D21H19/72, B65D65/02, B65D65/40, D21H11/04, D21H19/20, D21H19/18, D21H19/22, D21H19/58, D21H19/60, D21H27/10 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
D21H19/20 (EP);
D21H27/10 (EP,US);
B65D65/02 (US);
B65D65/40 (US);
D21H11/04 (EP,US);
D21H19/18 (EP);
D21H19/22 (EP);
D21H19/40 (US);
D21H19/58 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/14] | D21H19/72, B65D65/02, B65D65/40, D21H11/04, D21H19/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Title | German: | HEISSSIEGELBARES PAPIER UND VERPACKUNGSBEUTEL | [2023/14] | English: | HEAT-SEALABLE PAPER AND PACKAGING BAG | [2023/14] | French: | PAPIER THERMOSCELLABLE ET SAC D'EMBALLAGE | [2023/14] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2022 | Translation filed | 11.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 28.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2007078537 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al); | [XYI]WO2014071986 (MONDI AG [AT]); | [Y]EP2963178 (BILLERUDKORSNAES AB [SE]); | [Y]EP3088606 (BILLERUDKORSNAES AB [SE]); | [XYI]WO2019107025 (OJI HOLDINGS CORP [JP]) | International search | [Y]JPH0371830 (DAICEL CHEM); | [Y]JPH05147664 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [Y]JPH0722944U ; | [A]JP2007154322 (NIPPON SEITAI KK) | by applicant | JP6580291B |