EP4159758 - RHFGF21 FUSION PROTEIN, POLYNUCLEOTIDE ENCODING RHFGF21 FUSION PROTEIN, COMPOSITION CONTAINING RHFGF21 FUSION PROTEIN, AND USE OF RHFGF21 FUSION PROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jiangsu Kanionreal Biomedical Technology Co., Ltd. Jiangning Industrial City Economic And Technological Development Zone Lianyungang, Jiangsu 222047 / CN | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIAO, Wei Lianyungang, Jiangsu 222047 / CN | 02 /
LI, Deshan Lianyungang, Jiangsu 222047 / CN | 03 /
YU, Dan Lianyungang, Jiangsu 222047 / CN | 04 /
LIU, Zhihang Lianyungang, Jiangsu 222047 / CN | 05 /
WANG, Zhenzhong Lianyungang, Jiangsu 222047 / CN | 06 /
YIN, Chengkai Lianyungang, Jiangsu 222047 / CN | 07 /
SUN, Xu Lianyungang, Jiangsu 222047 / CN | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 21814253.7 | 27.05.2021 | [2023/14] | WO2021CN96292 | Priority number, date | CN202010468160 | 28.05.2020 Original published format: CN202010468160 | [2023/14] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021239046 | Date: | 02.12.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4159758 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/22, C07K14/50, A61K38/00, A61P3/10 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
A61P1/16 (EP,CN);
C07K14/50 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K38/1825 (CN,US);
A61K47/64 (CN,KR);
A61P13/12 (EP,CN);
A61P25/00 (EP,CN);
A61P3/00 (EP,CN);
A61P3/04 (EP,CN,KR);
A61P3/06 (EP,CN,KR);
A61P3/10 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61P9/00 (EP,CN);
C07K7/06 (US);
C12N15/62 (KR);
C12N15/70 (EP,CN,KR);
A61K38/00 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Title | German: | RHFGF21-FUSIONSPROTEIN, FÜR RHFGF21-FUSIONSPROTEIN CODIERENDES POLYNUKLEOTID, ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT RHFGF21-FUSIONSPROTEIN UND VERWENDUNG VON RHFGF21-FUSIONSPROTEIN | [2023/14] | English: | RHFGF21 FUSION PROTEIN, POLYNUCLEOTIDE ENCODING RHFGF21 FUSION PROTEIN, COMPOSITION CONTAINING RHFGF21 FUSION PROTEIN, AND USE OF RHFGF21 FUSION PROTEIN | [2023/14] | French: | PROTÉINE DE FUSION RHFGF21, POLYNUCLÉOTIDE CODANT POUR LA PROTÉINE DE FUSION RHFGF21, COMPOSITION CONTENANT LA PROTÉINE DE FUSION RHFGF21, ET UTILISATION DE LA PROTÉINE DE FUSION RHFGF21 | [2023/14] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2022 | Translation filed | 22.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]CN108404119 (HARBIN BOAO BIOLOGICAL MEDICAL TECH DEVELOPMENT CO LTD); | [XY]CN108939050 (HARBIN BOAO BIOLOGICAL MEDICAL TECH DEVELOPMENT CO LTD); | International search | [X]WO2018018010 (METACRINE INC [US]); | [X]CN109310641 (PHASEBIO PHARMACEUTICALS INC); | [A]WO2019118701 (PURDUE RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US]); | [A]CN110343183 (DIANDOU GENE TECH NANJING CO LTD); | [A]WO2019236769 (UNIV OF MISSISSIPPI MEDICAL CENTER [US]); |