EP4248712 - HEATING STRUCTURE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | 26.01.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES 8 rue Louis Lormand La Verrière 78320 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis / FR | [2023/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEVIENNE, Nicolas 78322 Le Mesnil-Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | 02 /
PASCHUTINE, Alexandre 78322 Le Mesnil-Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | 03 /
WEIL, Alexandre 78322 Le Mesnil-Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | 04 /
DAUBA, Jérôme 78322 Le Mesnil-Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | 05 /
FEUILLARD, Vincent 78322 Le Mesnil-Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | [2023/39] | Representative(s) | Valeo Systèmes Thermiques Service Propriété Intellectuelle 8, rue Louis Lormand La Verrière 78320 Le Mesnil Saint Denis / FR | [2023/39] | Application number, filing date | 21814691.8 | 08.11.2021 | [2023/39] | WO2021EP80994 | Priority number, date | FR20200011910 | 19.11.2020 Original published format: FR 2011910 | [2023/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022106246 | Date: | 27.05.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4248712 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/26, B60H1/22 | [2023/39] | CPC: |
H05B3/267 (EP);
B60H1/2226 (EP);
B60H1/2227 (EP);
B60H2001/2268 (EP);
H05B2203/005 (EP);
H05B2203/019 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/39] | Title | German: | HEIZSTRUKTUR FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2023/39] | English: | HEATING STRUCTURE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2023/39] | French: | STRUCTURE CHAUFFANTE POUR VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2023/39] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/39] | 16.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6768086 (SULLIVAN W MARK [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,10 * column 1, lines 11-26,44-67; figures 1-6 * * column 3, lines 15-46 * * column 5, lines 12-52 *; | [XA]US2015014293 (BYTZEK DIETMAR [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,8-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0013] - [0016] - [0030] - [0037] - [0040]; figure 2 * [A] 7; | [X]US2019176574 (HOFMANN PHILIPP [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,10 * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] - [0014] - [0019] - [0030] , [0033] , [0048] - [0053]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2020015326 (GERSTER MARTIN [DE]) [Y] 1-5,10* paragraphs [0029] - [0038]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]FR3084294 (VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES [FR]) [Y] 1-5,10 * page 10, line 13 - page 11, line 30; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | US2016059669 |