EP4240673 - DOUBLE-WALLED INSULATED BOX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] | 12.01.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TheGreenFlux 31 boulevard des Belges 69006 Lyon / FR | For all designated states DSI Plastics 6 Boulevard des Belges 69006 Lyon / FR | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUBLY, Grégory 69006 Lyon / FR | 02 /
DUBLY, Frédéric 20144 ZONZA / FR | [2023/37] | Representative(s) | Germain Maureau 12, rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | [2023/37] | Application number, filing date | 21814832.8 | 03.11.2021 | [2023/37] | WO2021FR51941 | Priority number, date | FR20200011433 | 06.11.2020 Original published format: FR 2011433 | [2023/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022096826 | Date: | 12.05.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4240673 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/38, B65D81/26, B65D21/02, B65D43/02 | [2023/37] | CPC: |
B65D81/3818 (EP);
B65D21/0219 (EP);
B65D43/0212 (EP);
B65D81/261 (EP);
B65D2543/00027 (EP);
B65D2543/00194 (EP);
B65D2543/00296 (EP);
B65D2543/00509 (EP);
B65D2543/00537 (EP);
B65D2543/00555 (EP);
B65D2543/00648 (EP);
B65D2543/00694 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/37] | Title | German: | DOPPELWANDIGER ISOLIERKASTEN | [2023/37] | English: | DOUBLE-WALLED INSULATED BOX | [2023/37] | French: | CAISSE ISOTHERME À DOUBLE PAROI | [2023/37] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/37] | 03.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR1169126 (DESMEUZES, POULAIN ET KEMHADJIAN) [Y] 1-3,5-7,9 * figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0597769 (MONOPLAST SA [FR]) [Y] 1-3,5-7,9,10 * abstract *; | [A]DE9402365U (ETOL WERK EBERHARD TRIPP GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,6* figure 1 *; | [XY]DE29602003U (CRYO GENESIS EUROP LTD [HK]) [X] 8 * page 12, paragraph 3 - page 14, paragraph 1 * [Y] 5,10; | [X]WO9632333 (TEMP TOP CONTAINER SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 11 * page 8, line 27 - page 9, line 17; figure 7 * | by applicant | EP2085203 |