EP4232802 - DEFECT DETECTION IN MOVING FIBER-CONTAINING STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | 22.12.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kuraray America, Inc. 2625 Bay Area Boulevard, Suite 600 Houston TX 77058 / US | [2023/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COFFEY, Patrick Houston, Texas 77058 / US | 02 /
IWANSKI, Michael Ft. Mill, South Carolina 29715 / US | [2023/35] | Representative(s) | Biallo, Dario, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [2023/35] | Application number, filing date | 21816218.8 | 21.10.2021 | [2023/35] | WO2021US55938 | Priority number, date | US202063094481P | 21.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063094481 P | [2023/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022087193 | Date: | 28.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4232802 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/88, B65H63/06, D01H13/16, G01N21/89, G01N21/952 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
G01N21/952 (EP,KR);
B65H63/065 (EP,KR);
D04C3/48 (EP,KR);
D07B7/02 (EP,KR);
G01B11/08 (KR);
G01N21/8851 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] | Title | German: | FEHLERERKENNUNG IN BEWEGLICHEN FASERHALTIGEN STRUKTUREN | [2023/35] | English: | DEFECT DETECTION IN MOVING FIBER-CONTAINING STRUCTURES | [2023/35] | French: | DÉTECTION DE DÉFAUTS DANS DES STRUCTURES CONTENANT DES FIBRES EN MOUVEMENT | [2023/35] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | 30.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US3461299 (FELIX ERNST) [X] 1-7,14-20 * column 2, lines 49-57 * * column 3, lines 3-16, 19-27, 39-41 * * column 1, lines 26-43 * [A] 8[I] 9-13,21; | [XI]DE29521575U (LEUZE ELECTRONIC GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-9,14-17,20 * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 3 * * page 5, lines 17-22 * * page 7, lines 18-29 * * page 9, lines 4-14,16-21 * * figure 4 * [I] 5,10-13,18,19,21 | by applicant | US2010271638 | US8881496 |