EP4255954 - HEAT-CURABLE POLYURETHANE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | 09.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sika Technology AG Zugerstrasse 50 6340 Baar / CH | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHLUMPF, Michael 8143 Stallikon / CH | 02 /
REIMANN, Sven 8046 Zürich / CH | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | Sika Patent Attorneys C/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 8048 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2023/41] | Sika Patent Attorneys c/o Sika Technology AG Corp. IP Dept. Tüffenwies 16 Postfach 8048 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 21816478.8 | 30.11.2021 | [2023/41] | WO2021EP83607 | Priority number, date | EP20200212027 | 04.12.2020 Original published format: EP 20212027 | [2023/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022117576 | Date: | 09.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4255954 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/76, C08G18/75, C08G18/48, C08G18/10, C09J175/12, C08G18/30, C08K5/25, C08K3/04, C08K3/26, C08K5/12 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
C08G18/7671 (EP,KR);
C08G18/10 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/3834 (KR,US);
C08G18/246 (US);
C08G18/307 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/3262 (KR,US);
C08G18/4841 (EP,KR,US);
C08G18/643 (KR);
C08G18/755 (EP,KR);
C08G18/7621 (EP,KR);
C08L75/08 (US);
C09J175/08 (EP,KR);
C09J175/12 (EP,KR);
C08G2170/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08G2190/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08K2003/265 (EP);
C08K3/04 (EP);
C08K3/26 (EP);
C08K5/12 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/3262 (EP);
C08G18/10, C08G18/3834 (EP);
C08G18/10, C08G18/643 (EP);
C08K3/04, C08L75/04 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] | Title | German: | HITZEHÄRTBARE POLYURETHAN-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2023/41] | English: | HEAT-CURABLE POLYURETHANE COMPOSITIONS | [2023/41] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE POLYURÉTHANE THERMODURCISSABLES | [2023/41] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | 04.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US5231147 (HARTMAN TERRENCE L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,9,10,13-15 * column 14, line 40 - line 57; example 4 * * column 13, line 50 - line 64; example 2 * * column 12, line 11 - line 18 * * column 3, line 40 - line 47 * * claims 1, 12 * * column 6, line 57 - line 63 * [A] 4,5 [I] 6,8,11,12; | [XAI]US2005202946 (HATTORI TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,6-9,13-15 * paragraph [0132] - paragraph [0134] * * Herstellungsbeispiel 1; paragraph [0134] * * paragraph [0137] - paragraph [0138] * [A] 4,5[I] 2,10-12 | by applicant | EP0255572 | WO8806165 | EP0365984 | WO2009080738 | WO2015040097 |