EP4158923 - IOT DEVICE DISCOVERY AND IDENTIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Palo Alto Networks, Inc. 3000 Tannery Way Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DU, Jun Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | 02 /
ZHAO, Yilin Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2023/14] | Gill, David Alan WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 21817458.9 | 01.06.2021 | [2023/14] | WO2021US35278 | Priority number, date | US202063033004P | 01.06.2020 Original published format: US 202063033004 P | US202017133189 | 23.12.2020 Original published format: US202017133189 | [2023/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021247597 | Date: | 09.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4158923 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/00, H04W8/18, H04L9/40 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
H04L63/1433 (EP);
H04L63/205 (KR,US);
H04W8/005 (EP,US);
G06N20/00 (KR);
H04L63/104 (US);
H04L63/1408 (KR);
H04L63/1416 (EP);
H04L63/1425 (EP);
H04L63/145 (KR);
H04L63/162 (US);
H04L67/303 (KR);
H04W8/183 (US);
H04L63/20 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/14] | H04W8/00, H04W8/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Title | German: | ENTDECKUNG UND IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON IOT-VORRICHTUNGEN | [2023/14] | English: | IOT DEVICE DISCOVERY AND IDENTIFICATION | [2023/14] | French: | DÉCOUVERTE ET IDENTIFICATION DE DISPOSITIF IDO | [2023/14] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2017063889 (MUDDU SUDHAKAR [US], et al); | [I]US2018375887 (DEZENT NIMROD [IL], et al); | [A]EP3576373 (FIRSTPOINT MOBILE GUARD LTD [IL]) | International search | [Y]US2019268305 (XU ZHI [US], et al); | [Y]US2020177485 (SHURTLEFF MARK STEPHAN [US], et al) |