EP4149197 - LINK SELECTION METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | 27.04.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/11] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Yungui Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/11] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2023/11] | Application number, filing date | 21817876.2 | 31.05.2021 | [2023/11] | WO2021CN97435 | Priority number, date | CN202010505315 | 05.06.2020 Original published format: CN202010505315 | [2023/11] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021244490 | Date: | 09.12.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4149197 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/15, H04W72/21, H04W28/02, // H04W84/12 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
H04W72/21 (EP);
H04W28/0252 (KR);
H04W28/0278 (EP,CN,KR);
H04W48/18 (US);
H04W28/0263 (EP);
H04W28/0268 (CN,KR);
H04W72/12 (US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04W72/54 (CN,KR);
|
Former IPC [2023/11] | H04W74/00, H04W74/04, H04W84/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/11] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERBINDUNGSAUSWAHL UND COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2023/11] | English: | LINK SELECTION METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND COMPUTER READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2023/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE SÉLECTION DE LIAISON, ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2023/11] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2022 | Translation filed | 08.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 08.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/11] | 24.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2019335454 (HUANG PO-KAI [US], et al); | [Y]EP3654703 (MEDIATEK INC [TW]); | International search | [A]CN108353424 (LG ELECTRONICS INC); | [A]CN108401277 (COMBA TELECOM SYS CHINA CO LTD, et al); | [A]CN109246806 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [A]US2019289501 (MONTEMURRO MICHAEL PETER [CA], et al); | [X]CN110876165 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [X]CN111096044 (LG ELECTRONICS INC); |