Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023102743 | Global Dossier | 30.03.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20200068668 | 05.06.2020 | WO2021KR06849 | 02.06.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4164057 | Global Dossier | 22.11.2023 | A4 | EP4164057 | 12.04.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20200068668 | 05.06.2020 | WO2021KR06849 | 02.06.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021246769 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20200068668 | 05.06.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20210151611 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20200068668 | 05.06.2020 |