EP4120369 - RIBBON AND SOLAR CELL ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Risen Energy (Yiwu) Co., Ltd. No. 599 Sufu Road, Suxi Town Yiwu, Zhejiang 322000 / CN | [2023/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Qiang Zhejiang 322000 / CN | 02 /
HUANG, Rubin Zhejiang 322000 / CN | [2023/03] | Representative(s) | Baldus, Oliver Splanemann Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | [2023/03] | Application number, filing date | 21818222.8 | 30.04.2021 | [2023/03] | WO2021CN91603 | Priority number, date | CN20202126993U | 05.06.2020 Original published format: CN 202021026993 U | [2023/03] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021244200 | Date: | 09.12.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4120369 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/05 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
H01L31/048 (EP);
H01L31/0508 (EP,US);
H01L31/022433 (EP);
H01L31/0512 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/03] | Title | German: | BAND UND SOLARZELLENANORDNUNG | [2023/03] | English: | RIBBON AND SOLAR CELL ASSEMBLY | [2023/03] | French: | RUBAN ET ENSEMBLE PHOTOPILE | [2023/03] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2022 | Translation filed | 13.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/03] | 15.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]KR20130011328 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] - [0045] * * figures 1-6 * [I] 11; | [XDI]CN103972317 (WUXI SUNTECH POWER CO LTD) [XD] 1,2,4,6-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0051] - [0054] - [0058] - [0060] * * figures 4,5,7 *[I] 3,5,11; | [XI]JP2016219799 (MIGHTY CORP) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0026] , [0050] , [0075] , [0076] * * figures 1,2,9,10 * [I] 11; | [XI]US2020098943 (TERASHITA TORU [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0043] - [0057] * * figures 2-6 * [I] 11 | International search | [A]US2010108123 (AASBERG INGEMAR [SE], et al) [A] 1-18* entire document *; | [XY]CN202473995U (CHANGZHOU TRINA SOLAR ENERGY, et al) [X] 9-10, 14-16, 18 * description, paragraphs [0017]-[0018], and figures 1-5 * [Y] 11-13, 17; | [A]CN109244169 (HAIAN NENGDA ELECTRICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-18 * entire document *; | [XY]CN110936053 (HEBEI LIANZHIJIE WELDING TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-8 * description, paragraphs [0033]-[0039], and figure 1 * [Y] 11-13, 17; | [PX]CN212209516U (RISEN YIWU NEW ENERGY CO LTD) [PX] 1-18 * claims 1-10, description paragraphs [0045]-[0122], figures 1-15 * | by applicant | CN202473995U | CN103972317 |