EP4160700 - LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE AND DISPLAY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.10.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2023/14] | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-Ku, Tokyo, 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OOHATA, Toyoharu Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
KOYAMA, Takahiro Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/14] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 21818487.7 | 20.04.2021 | [2023/14] | WO2021JP15966 | Priority number, date | JP20200096343 | 02.06.2020 Original published format: JP 2020096343 | [2023/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021246068 | Date: | 09.12.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4160700 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/15, H01L33/14, // H01L25/075 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
H01L27/153 (EP);
H01L33/58 (EP,US);
H01L25/0753 (EP,US);
H01L33/08 (US);
H01L33/145 (EP);
H01L33/46 (EP,US);
H01L33/502 (US);
H01L2224/05567 (US);
H01L2224/05573 (US);
H01L2224/06051 (US);
H01L2224/06131 (US);
H01L2224/13023 (US);
H01L2224/16235 (US);
H01L2224/32058 (US);
H01L2224/32225 (US);
H01L2224/73204 (US);
H01L24/05 (US);
H01L24/06 (US);
H01L24/13 (US);
H01L24/16 (US);
H01L24/32 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/14] | H01L33/14, G09F9/33, H01L33/08, H01L33/20, H01L33/50, H01L33/58 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Title | German: | LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2023/14] | English: | LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE AND DISPLAY APPARATUS | [2023/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ET APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE | [2023/14] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2022 | Translation filed | 20.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 09.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.10.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2019067529 (DOAN TRUNG TRI [TW], et al); | [A]CN110444560 (YUNGU GUAN TECH CO LTD) | International search | [A]KR20140085946 (SEOUL VIOSYS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-21; | [A]JP2014192411 (UNIV TOYOHASHI TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-21; | [A]JP2015201473 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-21; | [A]US2018187839 (VAMPOLA KENNETH JOHN [US]) [A] 1-21; | [A]US2019131342 (CHEN YI-JYUN [TW], et al) [A] 1-21; | [A]US2019189679 (KWAK YONGSEOK [KR], et al)[A] 1-21 | by applicant | JP2016221316 | JP2020096343 |