EP4143916 - A HEAT-RESISTANT BATTERY SEPARATORS AND RELATED BATTERIES AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celgard, LLC 13800 South Lakes Drive Charlotte, NC 28273 / US | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REINARTZ, Stefan Waxhaw, NC 28173 / US | 02 /
RAPLEY, James Concord, NC 28027 / US | 03 /
ALEXANDER, Daniel, R. Matthews, NC 28104 / US | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6, D06 F9C7 / IE | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 21818561.9 | 04.06.2021 | [2023/10] | WO2021US35848 | Priority number, date | US202063034413P | 04.06.2020 Original published format: US 202063034413 P | [2023/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021247964 | Date: | 09.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4143916 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 09.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/489, H01M10/052 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
H01M50/449 (EP);
H01M10/658 (US);
H01M50/409 (EP);
H01M50/414 (EP);
H01M50/423 (EP,US);
H01M50/434 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Title | German: | WÄRMEBESTÄNDIGE BATTERIESEPARATOREN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE BATTERIEN UND VERFAHREN | [2023/10] | English: | A HEAT-RESISTANT BATTERY SEPARATORS AND RELATED BATTERIES AND METHODS | [2023/10] | French: | SÉPARATEURS DE BATTERIE RÉSISTANTS À LA CHALEUR ET BATTERIES ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2023/10] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 01.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2007277580 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) [Y] 25, 28, 29 * , abstract *; | [Y]US2013224632 (ROUMI FARSHID [US]) [Y] 2, 4-20 * , paragraphs [0030], [0042], [0044], [0072], [0083], [0084], [0086], fig.3 *; | [Y]US2015064429 (IWAYA WATARU [JP], et al) [Y] 15, 16 * , paragraphs [0031]-[0032] *; | [A]KR101701808B (FIBERTECH CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-29* , paragraphs [0007], [0008], [0035] *; | [XY]US2019013504 (CHOI HYEONSUN [KR], et al) [X] 1, 3, 21, 22-24, 26, 27 * , paragraphs [0005], [0006], [0013]-[0016], [0023], [0025], [0052] * [Y] 2, 4-20, 25, 28, 29 |