EP4163350 - WATER REPELLENT COMPOSITION, KIT, WATER REPELLENT FIBER PRODUCT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEISEI CHEMICAL WORKS, LTD. 1 Nakazawacho Nishikyogoku Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615-8666 / JP | [2023/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMURA, Tatsuya Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615-8666 / JP | 02 /
DAIDO, Naoki Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615-8666 / JP | 03 /
NISHIMURA, Hiroshi Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615-8666 / JP | 04 /
HASHIMOTO, Takafumi Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615-8666 / JP | [2023/15] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2023/15] | Application number, filing date | 21818596.5 | 03.06.2021 | [2023/15] | WO2021JP21154 | Priority number, date | JP20200096856 | 03.06.2020 Original published format: JP 2020096856 | [2023/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021246475 | Date: | 09.12.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4163350 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/18, C08G18/08, C08G18/10, C08G18/63, C08G18/79, C08G18/80, D06M13/395, D06M15/564 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
C08G18/10 (EP,KR);
C09K3/18 (KR);
C08G18/08 (KR);
C08G18/0866 (EP);
C08G18/12 (EP);
C08G18/227 (EP);
C08G18/283 (EP);
C08G18/284 (EP);
C08G18/3206 (EP);
C08G18/4018 (EP);
C08G18/4216 (EP);
C08G18/44 (EP);
C08G18/4812 (EP);
C08G18/4825 (EP);
C08G18/4829 (EP);
C08G18/4854 (EP);
C08G18/6237 (EP);
C08G18/63 (KR);
C08G18/6607 (EP);
C08G18/664 (EP);
C08G18/6674 (EP);
C08G18/7831 (EP);
C08G18/79 (KR);
C08G18/792 (EP);
C08G18/80 (KR);
C08G18/8029 (EP);
C08G18/8077 (EP);
C08L75/04 (EP);
D06M13/395 (KR);
D06M15/263 (EP);
D06M15/267 (EP);
D06M15/27 (EP);
D06M15/564 (EP,KR);
D06M15/568 (EP);
D06M15/572 (EP);
D06M15/576 (EP);
D06M15/643 (EP);
D06M15/6433 (EP);
D06M2200/10 (EP);
D06M2200/12 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/2865 (EP);
C08G18/10, C08G18/48 (EP);
C08G18/12, C08G18/286 (EP);
C08G18/12, C08G18/2865 (EP);
C08G18/12, C08G18/3275 (EP);
C08L75/04, C08L33/12 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] | Title | German: | WASSERABWEISENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, KIT, WASSERABWEISENDES FASERPRODUKT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2023/15] | English: | WATER REPELLENT COMPOSITION, KIT, WATER REPELLENT FIBER PRODUCT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2023/15] | French: | COMPOSITION HYDROFUGE, KIT, PRODUIT FIBREUX HYDROFUGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ASSOCIÉ | [2023/15] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2022 | Translation filed | 10.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2022 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5508370 (REIFF HELMUT [DE], et al); | [A]EP3460021 (MEISEI CHEMICAL WORKS LTD [JP]) | International search | [A]WO2007114302 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2010229593 (OHARA PALLADIUM KAGAKU KK); | [A]WO2011122442 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2013155459 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [A]WO2017199726 (MEISEI CHEMICAL WORKS LTD [JP]); | [A]JP2018062720 (MATSUMOTO YUSHI SEIYAKU KK); | [A]JP2019026965 (SEIREN CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2009177415 | US2010190397 | WO2016178429 | JP2017066325 | JP2017155095 | JP2017533976 | JP2017206775 | JP2017538793 | JP2018095879 | JP2018104866 | JP2018119250 | WO2019026593 | JP2019026747 | JP2019026746 | WO2019163570 | JP2019196463 | JP2020002197 |