Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
19.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
04.08.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] |
04.08.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] |
01.04.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.03.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.04.2023 [2023/15] |
10.03.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 12.04.2023 [2023/15] |
13.02.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.11.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.11.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.11.2022 | Change - representative | |
11.11.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.01.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
10.12.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
10.12.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor |