Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220163486 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021JP21154 | 03.06.2021 | JP2020096856 | 03.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7009675B | Global Dossier | 25.01.2022 | B1 | JPWO2021246475 | 09.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021JP21154 | 03.06.2021 | JP2020096856 | 03.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115698221 | Global Dossier | 03.02.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021JP21154 | 03.06.2021 | JP2020096856 | 03.06.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4163350 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2024 | A4 | EP4163350 | 12.04.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021JP21154 | 03.06.2021 | JP2020096856 | 03.06.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021246475 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2020096856 | 03.06.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW202208590 | 01.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2020096856 | 03.06.2020 |