Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
24.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
24.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
26.03.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.03.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.03.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
20.03.2024 | Change - representative | |
20.03.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.05.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.05.2023 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
13.12.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication |