EP4167431 - CHARGING/DISCHARGING APPARATUS, BATTERY CHARGING METHOD, AND CHARGING/DISCHARGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | 03.10.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology (Hong Kong) Limited Level 19, China Building 29 Queen's Road Central Central, Central And Western District / HK | [2024/40] |
Former [2023/16] | For all designated states Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Limited No. 2 Xingang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Ningde City Fujian 352100 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZUO, Xiyang Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 02 /
YAN, Yu Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 03 /
LI, Bao Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Xiao Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 05 /
LI, Zhanliang Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | 06 /
LIN, Longzhen Ningde, Fujian 352100 / CN | [2023/16] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2023/16] | Application number, filing date | 21819311.8 | 29.07.2021 | [2023/16] | WO2021CN109372 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023004711 | Date: | 02.02.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4167431 | Date: | 19.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.02.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/02, H01M10/44 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
H02J7/00711 (EP);
B60L53/24 (KR);
H02J7/007182 (EP,KR,US);
B60L53/62 (EP);
B60L55/00 (EP);
B60L58/13 (EP,KR);
B60L58/16 (EP,KR);
H01M10/052 (EP);
H01M10/425 (EP,US);
H01M10/441 (EP);
H02J3/32 (US);
H02J7/00032 (KR);
H02J7/0014 (KR);
H02J7/0048 (US);
H02J7/00714 (KR);
H02J7/00716 (EP);
H02M3/33584 (US);
B60L2210/10 (EP,KR,US);
B60L2210/30 (EP,KR,US);
B60L2240/545 (EP,KR);
B60L2240/547 (EP,KR);
B60L2240/549 (EP);
B60Y2200/91 (KR);
H01M2010/4271 (US);
H01M2010/4278 (EP);
H01M2220/20 (EP);
H02J2207/20 (EP,KR,US);
H02J2310/48 (EP);
H02J7/00036 (EP);
H02J7/342 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/16] | Title | German: | LADE-/ENTLADEVORRICHTUNG, BATTERIELADEVERFAHREN UND LADE-/ENTLADESYSTEM | [2023/16] | English: | CHARGING/DISCHARGING APPARATUS, BATTERY CHARGING METHOD, AND CHARGING/DISCHARGING SYSTEM | [2023/16] | French: | APPAREIL DE CHARGE/DÉCHARGE, PROCÉDÉ DE CHARGE DE BATTERIE ET SYSTÈME DE CHARGE/DÉCHARGE | [2023/16] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2021 | Translation filed | 14.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 14.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2021 | Examination requested [2023/16] | 27.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2013039753 (AEROVIRONMENT INC [US], et al); | [YA]US2017106764 (BEASTON VIRGIL LEE [US], et al); | [A]GB2572757 (MOOG UNNA GMBH [DE]); | [YA]US2021070185 (LIU XUECHAO [HK], et al) |