EP4255308 - ANALYSING ULTRASOUND IMAGE DATA OF THE RECTUS ABDOMINIS MUSCLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Jingping 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
HONG, Xiaowei 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
CHEN, Zhouye 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
MENG, Yishuang 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 21819470.2 | 01.12.2021 | [2023/41] | WO2021EP83822 | Priority number, date | WO2020CN133817 | 04.12.2020 Original published format: PCT/CN2020/133817 | EP20210152871 | 22.01.2021 Original published format: EP 21152871 | [2023/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022117674 | Date: | 09.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4255308 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4255308 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/08 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
A61B8/08 (EP);
G06T7/0012 (US);
A61B8/0858 (EP,US);
A61B8/5207 (EP);
A61B8/5223 (EP);
G06T7/70 (US);
G06T2207/10016 (US);
G06T2207/10132 (US);
G06T2207/20081 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANALYSE VON ULTRASCHALLBILDDATEN DER RECTUS-ABDOMINIS-MUSKELN | [2024/04] | English: | ANALYSING ULTRASOUND IMAGE DATA OF THE RECTUS ABDOMINIS MUSCLES | [2023/41] | French: | ANALYSE DE DONNÉES D'IMAGES ULTRASONORES DES MUSCLES DU RECTUS ABDOMINIS | [2024/04] |
Former [2023/41] | ANALYSE VON ULTRASCHALLBILDDATEN DER REKTUSABDOMINISMUSKELN | ||
Former [2023/41] | ANALYSE DE DONNÉES D'IMAGES ULTRASONORES DES MUSCLES DROITS DE L'ABDOMEN | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | 04.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2017319107 (NGUYEN THUC-UYEN [US]); | [A]KR20190016206 (UNIV KOREA RES & BUS FOUND [KR]); | [A]RU2692974 (FEDERALNOE GOSUDARSTVENNOE BYUDZHETNOE UCHREZHDENIE GOSUDARSTVENNYJ NAUCHNYJ TSENTR KOLOPROKTOLOGII [RU]); | [A]WO2020217462 (HIL CO LTD [JP]); | by applicant | US5997479 | US6013032 | US6283919 | US6443896 | US6458083 | US6530885 | US6623432 | US2017319107 | RU2692974 |