EP4241001 - APPARATUS FOR SUPPORTING AN OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rapier Star Holdings Limited Star Business Park Congleton Road Macclesfield Cheshire SK11 9JA / GB | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FURNESS, David Macclesfield Cheshire SK11 9JA / GB | 02 /
FURNESS, Mark Macclesfield Cheshire SK11 9JA / GB | 03 /
DAVIDSON, Paul Macclesfield Cheshire SK11 9JA / GB | [2023/37] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [2023/37] | Application number, filing date | 21819561.8 | 24.11.2021 | [2023/37] | WO2021GB53053 | Priority number, date | GB20200018440 | 24.11.2020 Original published format: GB 202018440 | GB20210002979 | 03.03.2021 Original published format: GB 202102979 | [2023/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022112762 | Date: | 02.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4241001 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16L3/133, F16L3/137 | [2023/37] | CPC: |
F16L3/133 (EP,US);
F16L3/137 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/37] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM TRAGEN EINES OBJEKTS | [2023/37] | English: | APPARATUS FOR SUPPORTING AN OBJECT | [2023/37] | French: | APPAREIL DE SOUTIEN D?UN OBJET | [2023/37] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/37] | 05.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0041806 (HUXTABLE PETER JOHN) [A] 1-83 * figure 5 *; | [A]GB2097508 (MICHIGAN HANGER) [A] 1-83 * figure 1 *; | [A]GB2336622 (BLOXWICH TRANSPORT PROD LTD [GB]) [A] 1-83 * figure 3 *; | [A]WO2016075311 (VOLVO TRUCK CORP [SE]) [A] 1-83* figure 4b * |