EP4256102 - AL-SI CORROSION PROTECTION LAYERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | 09.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oerlikon Surface Solutions AG, Pfäffikon Churerstrasse 120 8808 Pfäffikon / CH | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMM, Jürgen 7304 Maienfeld / CH | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | Bals & Vogel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Konrad-Zuse-Str. 4 44801 Bochum / DE | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 21819720.0 | 18.11.2021 | [2023/41] | WO2021EP00144 | Priority number, date | DE20201007352 | 02.12.2020 Original published format: DE102020007352 | [2023/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022117220 | Date: | 09.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4256102 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/32, C23C16/24, C23C14/00, C23C14/08, C23C14/22, C23C16/44 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
C23C14/325 (EP,KR,US);
C23C28/04 (KR,US);
C23C14/0021 (EP,KR);
C23C14/08 (EP,KR);
C23C14/081 (US);
C23C14/10 (US);
C23C14/22 (EP,KR);
C23C16/24 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/44 (EP,KR);
C23C16/50 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] | Title | German: | Al-Si KORROSIONSSCHUTZSCHICHTEN | [2023/41] | English: | AL-SI CORROSION PROTECTION LAYERS | [2023/41] | French: | COUCHES DE PROTECTION CONTRE LA CORROSION AL-SI | [2023/41] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | 02.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   05.01.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6444335 (WANG HONGYU [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6 * column 5, line 47 - line 48; figure 1 * * column 3, line 44 - line 48 *; | [A]WO2006099758 (UNAXIS BALZERS AG [LI], et al) [A] 7* page 8, line 24 - line 30 *; | [XI]US2016297717 (SCHNEIDERBANGER STEFAN [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,8 * paragraphs [0011] , [0 22] , [0 32] * [I] 5 | by applicant | DE102015212588 |