Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024003015 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP00144 | 18.11.2021 | DE102020007352 | 02.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20230116003 | Global Dossier | 03.08.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP00144 | 18.11.2021 | DE102020007352 | 02.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023554247 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP00144 | 18.11.2021 | DE102020007352 | 02.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN116547406 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP00144 | 18.11.2021 | DE102020007352 | 02.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3199347 | Global Dossier | 09.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP00144 | 18.11.2021 | DE102020007352 | 02.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4256102 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP00144 | 18.11.2021 | DE102020007352 | 02.12.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022117220 | Global Dossier | 09.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102020007352 | 02.12.2020 |