EP4251792 - RUTHENIUM ALLOY LAYER AND ITS LAYER COMBINATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2023 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | 02.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Umicore Galvanotechnik GmbH Klarenbergstrasse 53-79 73525 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGER, Sascha 73527 Schwaebisch Gmuend / DE | 02 /
BRONDER, Klaus 73116 Waeschenbeuren / DE | 03 /
MANZ, Uwe 73563 Moegglingen / DE | 04 /
POHL, Martin 73525 Schwäbisch Gmuend / DE | 05 /
STEGMAIER, Martin 75249 Kieselbronn / DE | 06 /
WAHL, Matthias 73527 Taeferrot / DE | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | Retzow, Stefan Umicore AG & Co. KG Patente Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 21820188.7 | 25.11.2021 | [2023/40] | WO2021EP82914 | Priority number, date | DE202010131371 | 26.11.2020 Original published format: DE102020131371 | [2023/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022112379 | Date: | 02.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4251792 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C25D3/56, C25D5/12 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
C25D3/56 (EP,KR);
C25D3/52 (US);
C25D17/007 (KR);
C25D17/10 (KR);
C25D21/02 (US);
C25D3/565 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] | Title | German: | RUTHENIUMLEGIERUNGSSCHICHT UND DEREN SCHICHTKOMBINATIONEN | [2023/40] | English: | RUTHENIUM ALLOY LAYER AND ITS LAYER COMBINATIONS | [2023/40] | French: | COUCHE D'ALLIAGE DE RUTHÉNIUM ET SES COMBINAISONS DE COUCHES | [2023/40] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/40] | 26.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0018165 (INCO EUROP LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-4,6-14 * abstract * * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 27 *; | [XA]US6117301 (FREUDENBERGER RENATE [DE], et al) [X] 15 * abstract * * example 2 * [A] 1-14; | [XY]EP2757180 (VALMET S P A [IT]) [X] 15 * abstract * * examples 1, 2 * * paragraphs [0018] , [ 0020] , [ 0031] * [Y] 1-4,6-14; | [A]DE102019109188 (UMICORE GALVANOTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * examples 1, 2 * * paragraphs [0013] , [ 0037] *; | [E]AT523922B (IWG ING W GARHOEFER GES M B H [AT]) [E] 1-4,6-15 * abstract ** example 4 * | by applicant | DE1959907 | US3692641 | US4082625 | US4297178 | GB2101633 | DE102011105207 | WO2018142430 | - KANANI, N, Galvanotechnik, Hanser Verlag, (20000000), page 84 | - COBLEY, A.J. et al., "The use uf insoluble Anodes in Acid Sulphate Copper Electrodeposition Solutions", Trans IMF, (20010000), vol. 79, no. 3, page 113,114, XP001023283 |