EP4031942 - ROBOTIC PROCESS AUTOMATION ARCHITECTURES AND PROCESSES FOR HOSTING, MONITORING, AND RETRAINING MACHINE LEARNING MODELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UiPath, Inc. 90 Park Avenue, 20th Floor New York, NY 10016 / US | [2022/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHRIVASTAVA, Shashank New York, New York 10016 / US | [2022/30] | Representative(s) | Patel, Binesh Beuro IP Limited 11 St. Paul's Square Birmingham B3 1RB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/30] | Patel, Binesh Beuro IP Limited 11 St. Paul's Square Birmingham B3 1RB / GB | Application number, filing date | 21820842.9 | 28.10.2021 | [2022/30] | WO2021US56924 | Priority number, date | US202117143392 | 07.01.2021 Original published format: US202117143392 | IN202011051237 | 25.11.2020 Original published format: IN202011051237 | IN202011051236 | 25.11.2020 Original published format: IN202011051236 | [2022/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022115198 | Date: | 02.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4031942 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/04, G06N3/08, G06F9/44 | [2022/30] | CPC: |
G06F21/6218 (EP,US);
G06Q10/0633 (KR);
G06F30/27 (US);
G06F21/602 (US);
G06F8/61 (EP,US);
G06F9/451 (US);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06N20/20 (KR);
G06N3/008 (EP,US);
G06N3/10 (US);
G06N3/105 (EP,US);
G06Q10/10 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROBOTERPROZESSAUTOMATISIERUNGSARCHITEKTUREN UND -PROZESSE FÜR DAS HOSTING, ÜBERWACHEN UND UMLERNEN VON MASCHINENLERNMODELLEN | [2022/30] | English: | ROBOTIC PROCESS AUTOMATION ARCHITECTURES AND PROCESSES FOR HOSTING, MONITORING, AND RETRAINING MACHINE LEARNING MODELS | [2022/30] | French: | ARCHITECTURES D'AUTOMATISATION DE PROCESSUS ROBOTIQUES ET PROCESSUS D'HÉBERGEMENT, DE SURVEILLANCE ET DE NOUVELLE FORMATION DE MODÈLES D'APPRENTISSAGE AUTOMATIQUE | [2022/30] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/30] | 19.07.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2005033709 (MENG ZHUO [US], et al) [Y] 5,12,20 * paragraph [0077] *; | [Y]US2016358101 (BOWERS STUART MICHAEL [US], et al) [Y] 2,17-22 * paragraph [0017] *; | [A]US2019138946 (ASHER SARA BETH [US], et al) [A] 1-22* claims 1-14 *; | [Y]US2019156247 (FAULHABER JR THOMAS ALBERT [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * paragraphs [0064], [0125] *; | [Y]US2020134374 (OROS ANDREI ROBERT [RO]) [Y] 1-22 * paragraphs [0032]-[0033], [0057], [0071], [0082]-[0083], [0085], [0089]-[0091], [0093], [0098], [0103]-[0104], [0107]; claims 5, 12; and figures 10, 14 * |