Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023271859 | Global Dossier | 31.08.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2020100441 | 09.06.2020 | WO2021JP22007 | 09.06.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3186879 | Global Dossier | 16.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2020100441 | 09.06.2020 | WO2021JP22007 | 09.06.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4162957 | Global Dossier | 14.08.2024 | A4 | EP4162957 | 12.04.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2020100441 | 09.06.2020 | WO2021JP22007 | 09.06.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021251444 | Global Dossier | 16.12.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2020100441 | 09.06.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2021194062 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2021 | A | JP6836297B | 24.02.2021 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP2020100441 | 09.06.2020 |