EP4162317 - LENS WITH ASYMMETRIC PROJECTION TO TREAT ASTIGMATISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | 19.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | 19.07.2024 | Change - classification | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acucela Inc. 600 University Street, Suite 2900 Seattle, WA 98101-4174 / US | [2023/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUSCEMI, Philip M. Mount Pleasant, South Carolina 29464 / US | 02 /
KUBOTA, Ryo Seattle, Washington 98101-4174 / US | [2023/15] | Representative(s) | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2023/15] | Application number, filing date | 21821692.7 | 07.06.2021 | [2023/15] | WO2021US36097 | Priority number, date | US202063036170P | 08.06.2020 Original published format: US 202063036170 P | [2023/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021252318 | Date: | 16.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4162317 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G02C11/04, G02C7/02 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
A61N5/0622 (EP,US);
G02C7/04 (EP,KR);
G02C11/10 (EP,KR);
A61F9/0079 (EP);
A61N2005/0626 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0648 (EP,US);
G02C2202/24 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] | Title | German: | LINSE MIT ASYMMETRISCHER PROJEKTION ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ASTIGMATISMUS | [2023/15] | English: | LENS WITH ASYMMETRIC PROJECTION TO TREAT ASTIGMATISM | [2023/15] | French: | LENTILLE À PROJECTION ASYMÉTRIQUE POUR TRAITER L'ASTIGMATISME | [2023/15] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/15] | 28.07.2023 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 21.08.2023 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011085129 (LEGERTON JEROME A [US], et al); | [A]US2015250583 (ROSEN ROBERT [NL], et al); | [X]WO2020014074 (ACUCELA INC [US]) | International search | [A]US2013199995 (JIANG PENG [US], et al); | [XYA]US2013278887 (LEGERTON JEROME A [US]); | [Y]US2014218647 (BLUM RONALD D [US], et al); | [A]US2016270656 (SAMEC NICOLE ELIZABETH [US], et al); | [A]US2018017814 (TUAN KUANG-MON ASHLEY [US], et al); | [A]US2018188556 (PORTNEY VALDEMAR [US]); | [XYA]WO2020028177 (ACUCELA INC [US]) |