EP4132018 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING PROXIMITY OF ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEDAN, Stanislav L'va Tolstogo St. Kyiv, 01032 / UA | 02 /
ALIEKSIEIEV, Mykola L'va Tolstogo St. Kyiv, 01032 / UA | 03 /
GUSH, Roman L'va Tolstogo St. Kyiv, 01032 / UA | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21822362.6 | 03.06.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021KR06956 | Priority number, date | KR20200069847 | 09.06.2020 Original published format: KR 20200069847 | [2023/06] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021251687 | Date: | 16.12.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4132018 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/02, H04B17/318, H04W88/02, H04W12/63, H04W8/00, H04B17/20 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
H04W8/005 (EP);
H04W4/023 (EP,KR);
H04B17/318 (EP,KR,US);
G01S11/06 (EP);
G01S5/0249 (EP);
H04B17/253 (EP);
H04W12/63 (EP);
H04W64/006 (EP);
H04W76/10 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/06] | H04W4/02, H04B17/318, H04W88/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER NÄHE EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2023/06] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING PROXIMITY OF ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2023/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE DÉTERMINER LA PROXIMITÉ D'UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2022 | Translation filed | 24.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2022 | Search fee paid | 24.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 22.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2016161020 (AFERO INC [US]) [X] 1-4,12-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0072] - [0095] * [I] 5-11; | [I] - LUO JUAN ET AL, Indoor Security Localization Algorithm Based on Location Discrimination Ability of AP, 16TH EUROPEAN CONFERENCE - COMPUTER VISION - ECCV 2020, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, PAGE(S) 472 - 487, (20191210), XP047532138 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-030-36938-5_29 | International search | [A]US9125144 (ORBACH JULIAN [AU], et al) [A] 1-15* See column 4, line 36 - column 6, line 44; and claims 1-2. *; | [A]US2017094470 (VENKATRAMAN SHANKAR [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0036]-[0051]; and claims 1-2. *; | [A]US2017332190 (JAMES BRYAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0019]-[0039]; claims 1-2; and figures 1-2. *; | [X]US2019191286 (TOKUMOTO HIROKAZU [JP]) [X] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0037]-[0099]; claims 18-22; and figures 4A-4D and 9. *; | [A]KR102048013B (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0050]-[0091]; and figures 4-8. * |