EP4156523 - POLAR ENCODING AND DECODING METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SATELLITE COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAI, Shengchen Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Huazi Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
TONG, Jiajie Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Xianbin Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
LI, Rong Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 06 /
WANG, Jun Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 07 /
HUANG, Wei Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/13] | Application number, filing date | 21822963.1 | 11.06.2021 | [2023/13] | WO2021CN99589 | Priority number, date | CN202010535335 | 12.06.2020 Original published format: CN202010535335 | [2023/13] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021249525 | Date: | 16.12.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4156523 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.12.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/13, H04L1/00, H03M13/27, H03M13/29, H03M13/09, H04B7/185 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
H03M13/13 (EP,CN);
H04L1/0057 (EP,CN,US);
H03M13/09 (EP,CN);
H03M13/15 (CN);
H03M13/27 (EP);
H03M13/2906 (EP);
H03M13/618 (EP);
H03M13/6368 (EP);
H04B7/185 (US);
H04B7/18543 (EP);
H04B7/18586 (CN);
H04L1/0041 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/13] | H03M13/13 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR POLARCODIERUNG UND DECODIERUNG FÜR SATELLITENKOMMUNIKATION | [2023/13] | English: | POLAR ENCODING AND DECODING METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SATELLITE COMMUNICATION | [2023/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE CODAGE ET DE DÉCODAGE POLAIRE POUR LA COMMUNICATION PAR SATELLITE | [2023/13] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2022 | Translation filed | 21.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 02.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN107276720 (UNIV HANGZHOU DIANZI) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US2019356342 (ZHANG HUAZI [CN], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0195] , [ 196] * * figures 1,5 *; | [XAI]EP3605902 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,2,6-8,11,13,14 * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0041] * * page 138 - page 146 * * claims 1,7,20,21 * * figure 6 * [A] 5 [I] 3,4,9,10,12,15 | International search | [X]CN107592181 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-39 * description paragraphs 0043-0052, paragraphs 0365-0380 *; | [X]CN109391345 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-39 * description paragraphs 0043-0052, paragraphs 0534-0550 *; | [A]CN110519012 (SPREADTRUM COMMUNICATIONS SHANGHAI INC) [A] 1-39* entire document *; | [X]CN111200476 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-39 * description paragraph 0062, paragraphs 0069-0077, paragraphs 0122-0161, figure 1 * |