EP4260036 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A DIFFERENTIAL PRESSURE SENSOR AND CORRESPONDING DIFFERENTIAL PRESSURE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | 16.02.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Endress+Hauser SE+Co. KG Hauptstrasse 1 79689 Maulburg / DE | [2023/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DORIA, Patrick 13407 Berlin / DE | [2023/42] | Representative(s) | Koslowski, Christine Adelheid Endress+Hauser Group Services (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG Colmarer Straße 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | [2023/42] | Application number, filing date | 21823217.1 | 26.11.2021 | [2023/42] | WO2021EP83100 | Priority number, date | DE202010133204 | 11.12.2020 Original published format: DE102020133204 | [2023/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022122409 | Date: | 16.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4260036 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01L13/02, G01L19/00, G01L19/06, G01L19/14 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
G01L13/025 (EP);
G01L19/142 (EP,US);
G01L19/0046 (EP);
G01L19/0618 (EP,US);
G01L19/0645 (EP,US);
G01L19/147 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES DIFFERENZDRUCKMESSAUFNEHMERS UND ENTSPRECHENDER DIFFERENZDRUCKMESSAUFNEHMER | [2023/42] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A DIFFERENTIAL PRESSURE SENSOR AND CORRESPONDING DIFFERENTIAL PRESSURE SENSOR | [2023/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN CAPTEUR DE PRESSION DIFFÉRENTIELLE ET CAPTEUR DE PRESSION DIFFÉRENTIELLE CORRESPONDANT | [2023/42] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/42] | 22.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4019388 (HALL II GEORGE R, et al) [A] 2 * column 1, line 5 - column 1, line 11; figure 1 * * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 21 * * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 68 *; | [Y]CN208818407U (DELSON IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0002]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024] *; | [Y]DE102018121446 (ENDRESS HAUSER SE CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0001]; figures 1,3 * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0044] *; | [A]CN210464778U (SHANGHAI ZIYOU INSTR CO LTD) [A] 3 * paragraph [0002]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] ** paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019] * | by applicant | DE102019132867 |