EP4240260 - NON-CORING NEEDLE WITH REVERSED SHARP EDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bentley InnoMed GmbH Lotzenäcker 3 72379 Hechingen / DE | [2023/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PESIS, Yossi 3750135 Pardes Hana / IL | 02 /
ROTTENBERG, Dan 3460152 Haifa / IL | [2023/37] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2023/37] | Application number, filing date | 21823355.9 | 08.11.2021 | [2023/37] | WO2021IB60322 | Priority number, date | US202063111153P | 09.11.2020 Original published format: US 202063111153 P | [2023/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022097111 | Date: | 12.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4240260 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/34, A61M5/32, A61B17/22 | [2023/37] | CPC: |
A61B17/3478 (EP,IL);
A61B17/32053 (US);
A61B17/3207 (US);
A61M5/3286 (EP,IL);
A61B2017/00845 (EP,IL);
A61B2017/22038 (US);
A61B2017/22094 (EP,IL,US);
A61B2017/22095 (EP,IL);
A61B2017/3454 (US);
A61M2205/192 (EP,IL)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/37] | Title | German: | NADEL OHNE KERNLOCKERUNG MIT UMGEKEHRTER SCHARFER KANTE | [2023/37] | English: | NON-CORING NEEDLE WITH REVERSED SHARP EDGE | [2023/37] | French: | AIGUILLE NON PERFORANTE À BORD TRANCHANT INVERSÉ | [2023/37] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/37] | 02.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2717599 (JENNIE HUBER); | [A]US3064651 (EDWARD HENDERSON); | [XI]DE20211110U (DIMITROV GEORGI [DE]); | [XI]US2003069550 (SHARP M KEITH [US]); | [A]US2009259126 (SAAL JEFFREY ALAN [US], et al); | [X]US2010010413 (LOITERMAN DAVID A [US], et al); | [XI]WO2020145181 (ZEON CORP [JP]) |